|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to LCA, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 407) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|