12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/09/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Pending introduction. |