|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to AEN/PSM, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 184).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Re-referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to AGR, WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|