12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/19/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/25/2021 | Pending introduction. |