Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HCR113 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.C.R. NO. 113 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.C.R. NO. 113
44 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.C.R. NO.
1010
1111 113
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION requesting the governor and mayor of the city and county of honolulu to affirm the safe access oahu program will not be UNNECESSARILY extended beyond the march 5, 2022, sunset date.
3030
3131 HOUSE CONCURRENT
3232
3333 RESOLUTION
3434
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939 requesting the governor and mayor of the city and county of honolulu to affirm the safe access oahu program will not be UNNECESSARILY extended beyond the march 5, 2022, sunset date.
4040
4141
4242
4343
4444
4545
4646
4747 WHEREAS, on September 13, 2021, pursuant to Order No. 2021‑15, the Safe Access Oahu program went into effect in the City and County of Honolulu to mitigate the high rate of COVID‑19 Delta variant infections on Oahu; and WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program requires all employees, contractors, and volunteers at businesses such as restaurants, bars, gyms, movie theaters, arcades, and other similar establishments to show proof of full vaccination against COVID-19 or a negative COVID-19 test result each week in order to operate; and WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program also requires all customers, except those twelve years of age or younger, to show proof of full vaccination or a negative COVID-19 test taken within the previous forty-eight hours in order to enter the establishment; and WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program was to remain in effect for sixty days and cease on November 13, 2021; and WHEREAS, on January 5, 2022, in response to the rise of infections from the Omicron variant of COVID-19, Mayor Rick Blangiardi issued Proclamation and Emergency Order No. 2022-01 (Order No. 2022-01), which retroactively extended the restrictions imposed by the Safe Access Oahu program through December 1, 2021; and WHEREAS, the restrictions imposed by the Safe Access Oahu program are to continue through the sixty-day emergency period established by Order No. 2022-01 that began on January 5, 2022; and WHEREAS, as of January 4, 2022, seventy-eight percent of the population of the City and County of Honolulu has received two doses of the COVID-19 vaccine; and WHEREAS, small businesses have been one of the hardest-hit sectors amid the COVID-19 pandemic; and WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program has negatively impacted Oahu's small businesses; and WHEREAS, a 2020 Yelp survey found that nine in every one thousand businesses in Hawaii have permanently closed, which is one of the highest rates in the United States, while in Honolulu, the figure was roughly eleven out of every one thousand businesses; and WHEREAS, hundreds of Hawaii businesses were on the brink of closure during the early days of the pandemic and faced further setbacks as the result of the rise in COVID-19 variant infections; and WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program expired on March 5, 2022; and WHEREAS, however, repeated extensions and retroactive application of the Safe Access Oahu program created confusion and placed undue burdens on local enterprises; and WHEREAS, broad and indefinite extensions of emergency proclamations by the Mayor and Governor may be abused and can cause confusion and distrust amongst the public; now, therefore, BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the Thirty-first Legislature of the State of Hawaii, Regular Session of 2022, the Senate concurring, that the Governor and Mayor of the City and County of Honolulu are requested to affirm the Safe Access Oahu program will not be unnecessarily extended beyond the March 5, 2022, sunset date; and BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that certified copies of this Concurrent Resolution be transmitted to the Governor and Mayor of the City and County of Honolulu. OFFERED BY: _____________________________ Report Title: Safe Access Oahu; Sunset Date; City and County of Honolulu
4848
4949 WHEREAS, on September 13, 2021, pursuant to Order No. 2021‑15, the Safe Access Oahu program went into effect in the City and County of Honolulu to mitigate the high rate of COVID‑19 Delta variant infections on Oahu; and
5050
5151
5252
5353 WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program requires all employees, contractors, and volunteers at businesses such as restaurants, bars, gyms, movie theaters, arcades, and other similar establishments to show proof of full vaccination against COVID-19 or a negative COVID-19 test result each week in order to operate; and
5454
5555
5656
5757 WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program also requires all customers, except those twelve years of age or younger, to show proof of full vaccination or a negative COVID-19 test taken within the previous forty-eight hours in order to enter the establishment; and
5858
5959
6060
6161 WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program was to remain in effect for sixty days and cease on November 13, 2021; and
6262
6363
6464
6565 WHEREAS, on January 5, 2022, in response to the rise of infections from the Omicron variant of COVID-19, Mayor Rick Blangiardi issued Proclamation and Emergency Order No. 2022-01 (Order No. 2022-01), which retroactively extended the restrictions imposed by the Safe Access Oahu program through December 1, 2021; and
6666
6767
6868
6969 WHEREAS, the restrictions imposed by the Safe Access Oahu program are to continue through the sixty-day emergency period established by Order No. 2022-01 that began on January 5, 2022; and
7070
7171
7272
7373 WHEREAS, as of January 4, 2022, seventy-eight percent of the population of the City and County of Honolulu has received two doses of the COVID-19 vaccine; and
7474
7575
7676
7777 WHEREAS, small businesses have been one of the hardest-hit sectors amid the COVID-19 pandemic; and
7878
7979
8080
8181 WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program has negatively impacted Oahu's small businesses; and
8282
8383
8484
8585 WHEREAS, a 2020 Yelp survey found that nine in every one thousand businesses in Hawaii have permanently closed, which is one of the highest rates in the United States, while in Honolulu, the figure was roughly eleven out of every one thousand businesses; and
8686
8787
8888
8989 WHEREAS, hundreds of Hawaii businesses were on the brink of closure during the early days of the pandemic and faced further setbacks as the result of the rise in COVID-19 variant infections; and
9090
9191
9292
9393 WHEREAS, the Safe Access Oahu program expired on March 5, 2022; and
9494
9595
9696
9797 WHEREAS, however, repeated extensions and retroactive application of the Safe Access Oahu program created confusion and placed undue burdens on local enterprises; and
9898
9999
100100
101101 WHEREAS, broad and indefinite extensions of emergency proclamations by the Mayor and Governor may be abused and can cause confusion and distrust amongst the public; now, therefore,
102102
103103
104104
105105 BE IT RESOLVED by the House of Representatives of the Thirty-first Legislature of the State of Hawaii, Regular Session of 2022, the Senate concurring, that the Governor and Mayor of the City and County of Honolulu are requested to affirm the Safe Access Oahu program will not be unnecessarily extended beyond the March 5, 2022, sunset date; and
106106
107107
108108
109109 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that certified copies of this Concurrent Resolution be transmitted to the Governor and Mayor of the City and County of Honolulu.
110110
111111
112112
113113
114114
115115
116116
117117 OFFERED BY: _____________________________
118118
119119
120120
121121 OFFERED BY:
122122
123123 _____________________________
124124
125125
126126
127127
128128
129129 Report Title:
130130
131131 Safe Access Oahu; Sunset Date; City and County of Honolulu