Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Referred to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 386).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, Perruso excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1671-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Costales, Hashimoto, Woodson, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 04-01-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1513-22), recommending referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:40AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to CAI, HET, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|