House
|
04/25/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 902) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-25-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4057) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to HMS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 381).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McKelvey, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1665-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|