Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to HTH/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 382).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McKelvey, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1667-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|