House
|
04/25/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 903).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-25-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Waived referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Report adopted, referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4056), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 366).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Adopted with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|