Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to HOU/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 446).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1742-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-22 3:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-22-22 10:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|