Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to CPN/HTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1765-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1547-22), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
To be offered.
|
|
|