Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to EET/TRS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 421).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-24-22 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
To be offered.
|
|
|