House
|
04/29/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 939).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-29-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4071) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-25-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to EDU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 425).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1705-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
To be offered.
|
|
|