LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR60
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HCR60
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HCR60
Action History
House
03/24/2022
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
03/17/2022
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-24-22 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
House
03/14/2022
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
House
03/10/2022
Offered
House
03/09/2022
To be offered.