House
|
05/05/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 950).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4102) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-22-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 429).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634-22), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
To be offered.
|
|
|