House
|
05/05/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 951).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4103) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-22-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Referred to AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 375).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Adopted with Representative(s) Marten, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matayoshi, Onishi voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1659-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Matayoshi, Tokioka; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred to AGR, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered
|
|
|