House | 04/01/2022 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McKelvey, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan excused (5). | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Offered |