House | 03/30/2022 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4). | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557-22), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, LoPresti, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-23-22 11:05AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:45AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Offered |