House | 03/31/2022 | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1639-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Offered | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | To be offered. |