House | 03/30/2022 | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4). | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553-22), recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Offered | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | To be offered. |