House | 03/31/2022 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (3). | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657-22), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-24-22 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Offered |