12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 340) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-09-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to TRS, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |