12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-09-21 3:00PM in conference room 016. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 016. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to GVO, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |