12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Re-Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to LCA, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |