12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-17-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to HTH, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |