12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 380) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to CPN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |