|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 1:30PM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, English Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 544).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1840) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-21 2:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1407) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 352) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from CPN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 201) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 10:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to CPN/PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|