Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1105 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 5, 2022
Bill February 11, 2021