Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1107 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 17, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021
Bill February 5, 2021