House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HMS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|