|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Re-Referred to HTH, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HTH, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|