Senate | 02/04/2022 | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2072) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha, Shimabukuro. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-03-22 10:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. | ||
12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. |