|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 128) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-05-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HTH, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|