|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 382) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Re-Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|