12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Misalucha ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to HMS, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |