|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 392) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 735) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:20PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|