12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on CPN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 10:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Referred to CPN/JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |