|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1502) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from EDN/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Ohno, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Yamane.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Re-referred to EDN/EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/EEP on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to EDN/EEP, JHA, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from EDU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to EDU/AEN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|