12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported from HWN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | The committee(s) on HWN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Referred to HWN/HOU, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |