|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Johanson Co-Chairs; Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1656) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Har; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 411) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to HTH, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|