|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 413) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Moriwaki. Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Fevella, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|