House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1332-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 13) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-02-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2008) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 372) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 3:00PM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to EDU/HMS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|