12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported from GVO/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 555) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Riviere. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 3:20PM; 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Referred to GVO/EET, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |