LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1390
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1390
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1390
Action History
12/10/2021
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Senate
02/10/2021
The committee(s) on GVO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-11-21 3:00PM; 016.
Senate
02/08/2021
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 016.
Senate
02/01/2021
Referred to GVO, WAM.
Senate
01/29/2021
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/27/2021
Introduced.