Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 5, 2022
Bill February 7, 2022