|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 53) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Re-Referred to HWN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to HWN/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|