12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Re-Referred to GVO/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-21 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Referred to GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Introduced. |