|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1226) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 14
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 14) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-16-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-10-21 10:10AM in conference room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 6) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 3:00PM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|