Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021