Senate | 02/03/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2043) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Referred to HTH, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Pending Introduction. |